+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (110)
Type:
Primary Sponsor