+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Monday, March 21, 2018, pending concurrence
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor