+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health