+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2526
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
On November 25, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor