+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied by H2892
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor