+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2425
On August 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On July 24, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Education
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor