+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor