+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 8, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services