+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, as amended, see S2332
- Read second
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2018
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2332
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor