+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2535
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday, May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday, March 22, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 7, 2018, pending concurrence
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor