+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2020
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended (Rules), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed.
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor