+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to be engrossed- See Roll Call #379 (Yeas 37 to Nays 0)
- Read third
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, May 17, 2018
On July 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor