+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2295
- Read second
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 25, 2019
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2295
- Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor