+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2538
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor