+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor