+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development