+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 13, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5351
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Revenue
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor