+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 3, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5307
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 10, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor