+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2294
- Read second
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 25, 2019
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2294
- Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor