+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third
- New draft (Friedman) substituted, see S3062
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 19, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 01:30 PM-02:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On July 18, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor