+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2976
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor