+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 394 of the Acts of 2018
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
- Bill reported favorably by committee
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
- Rules suspended
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently