+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday March 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor