+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor