+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
On September 27, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
On August 19, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Education
- Rules suspended
On July 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor