+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2565
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, in concurrence
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, June 15, 2018, pending concurrence
- Amendment adopted
- Rules suspended
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 31, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 13, 2018, pending concurrence
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
- Rules suspended
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently