+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2018
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment
- Rules suspended
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On August 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2018 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 15, 2018, pending concurrence
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
- Rules suspended
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently