+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- No further action taken
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On December 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on the Judiciary
- Rules suspended
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor