+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor