+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor