+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Accompanying S1276
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 12, 2021 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services