+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On August 24, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor