+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2019
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor