+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2520
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Monday July 2, 2018, pending concurrence
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities