+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2684
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor