+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary