+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor