+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S3063
On July 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 25, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday July 29, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor