+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Education
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor