+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied S1925
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Accompanied by H2825
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor