+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, see S2568
- Read second
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 28, 2018
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2568
On December 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor