+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2837
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor