+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2345
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in B-2
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 04/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
- Hearing scheduled for 04/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor