+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Higher Education