+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2442
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday February 8, 2018, pending concurrence
On August 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor