+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2809
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On December 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Adam G. Hinds (By Request)
Type:
Primary Sponsor