+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2432
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday April 9, 2018, pending concurrence
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure