+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 25, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H5018
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery