+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second
- New draft substituted, as amended, see S2545
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2545
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, October 6, 2021
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor