+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 7, 2018, pending concurrence
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor